blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0238686

EP0238686 - Slitter holder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.1991
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.07.1991 [1991/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIENES WERKE FÜR MASCHINENTEILE GMBH & CO KG
Kölner Strasse 7
51491 Overath / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/40]For all designated states
DIENES WERKE FÜR MASCHINENTEILE GMBH & CO KG
Kölner Strasse 7
D-5063 Overath 1 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Häger, Johannes
Bennauer Strasse 13
D-5063 Overath / DE
[1987/40]
Representative(s)Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/06]Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2
D-40882 Ratingen / DE
Former [1988/29]Weinkauff, Wolfgang
Patentanwälte Keil & Schaafhausen Eysseneckstrasse 31
D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE
Former [1987/40]Weinkauff, Wolfgang
Fuchshohl 71
D-6000 Frankfurt 50 / DE
Application number, filing date86104128.325.03.1986
[1987/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0238686
Date:30.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0238686
Date:08.08.1990
Language:DE
[1990/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:B26D5/04
[1987/40]
CPC:
B26D5/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/40]
TitleGerman:Scherenschnitt-Kreismesserhalter[1987/40]
English:Slitter holder[1987/40]
French:Support pour couteau circulaire[1987/40]
Examination procedure08.04.1986Examination requested  [1987/40]
28.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.1990Fee for grant paid
24.04.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3977284  ;
 [A]US2802528  ;
 [A]US3185010  ;
 [A]EP0113668  ;
 [AD]DE1024341
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.