EP0199133 - Chimney pipe insulating sheath of mineral fibres, and a pipe insulated in this way [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünzweig + Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1990/18] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states Grünzweig + Hartmann und Glasfaser AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bihy, Lothar Eugen-Hertel-Strasse 9 D-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
Roth, Klaus Weinheimer Strasse 47 D-6806 Viernheim / DE | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104193.7 | 26.03.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | DE19853514822 | 24.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3514822 | [1986/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199133 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199133 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199133 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04F17/02 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
E04F17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [1986/44] | Title | German: | Rohrdämmschale aus Mineralfasern sowie hiermit gedämmter Rohrstrang | [1986/44] | English: | Chimney pipe insulating sheath of mineral fibres, and a pipe insulated in this way | [1986/44] | French: | Enveloppe isolante en fibres minérales pour tuyau de cheminée ainsi qu'un tuyau isolé de cette façon | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.01.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   31.12.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH262208 (SPRING & SOEHNE [CH]); | [AD]DE1995206U (KRAUSS KAMINWERKE MUENCHEN GEI [DE]); | [AD]DE1922581 (SCHIEDEL KAMIN BETONWERK); | [AD]DE1815516 (SCHIEDEL KAMIN BETONWERK); | [AD]DE2118046 |