EP0238689 - Method for performing acoustic matching in a speech recognition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/40] | Method and apparatus for performing acoustic matching in a speech recognition system | ||
[1992/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahl, Lalit Rai Elisha Purdy Road Amawalk, N.Y. 10501 / US | 02 /
Mercer, Robert Leroy 669 Viewland Drive Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10598 / US | 03 /
Degennaro, Steven Vincent 38 Coulter Avenue Pawling, N.Y. 12564 / US | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto IBM Corporation Intellectcual Property Department Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Barth, Carl Otto IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1987/40] | Möhlen, Wolfgang C., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 86104216.6 | 27.03.1986 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238689 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238689 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
G10L15/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum akustischen Vergleichen in einem Spracherkennungssystem | [1992/13] | English: | Method for performing acoustic matching in a speech recognition system | [1992/13] | French: | Procédé pour effectuer une comparaison acoustique dans un système de reconnaissance de la parole | [1992/13] |
Former [1987/40] | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum akustischen Vergleichen in einem Spracherkennungssystem | ||
Former [1987/40] | Method and apparatus for performing acoustic matching in a speech recognition system | ||
Former [1987/40] | Procédé et dispositif pour effectuer une comparaison acoustique dans un système de reconnaissance de la parole | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 25.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.09.1992 | NL | 02.09.1992 | SE | 02.09.1992 | CH | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/04] | NL | 02.09.1992 | |
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/16] | NL | 02.09.1992 | |
SE | 02.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | NL | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 256, August 1985, page 418, Emsworth, Hampshire, GB: "Composite fenemic phones" | [ ] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Paris, FR, 3rd-5th May 1982, vol. 3, pages 1616-1620, IEEE, New York, US; J.-P. HATON et al.: "Problems in the design and use of a connected speech understanding system" |