EP0212053 - Graft polymers from vinyl monomers onto polyester resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zabrocki, Karl, Dr. Edelfalter 33 D-4044 Büttgen / DE | 02 /
Kress, Hans-Jürgen, Dr. Scheiblerstrasse 111 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Braun, Dietrich, Prof. Dr. Jakob-Jung-Strasse 56 D-6100 Darmstadt-Arheilgen / DE | 05 /
Emirze, Ararad, Dr. Kurpfalzstrasse 20 D-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86104237.2 | 27.03.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | DE19853512338 | 04.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3512338 | [1991/14] |
Former [1987/10] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0212053 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0212053 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/01, C08L67/02 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
C08F299/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/10] | C08F283/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/10] | Title | German: | Pfropfpolymerisate von Vinylmonomeren auf Polyesterharze | [1987/10] | English: | Graft polymers from vinyl monomers onto polyester resins | [1987/10] | French: | Polymères greffés de monomères vinyliques sur une résine de polyester | [1987/10] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4275176 |