EP0198290 - Method of casting aluminium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG Am Thyssenhaus 1 D-45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behr, Friedrich, Dr.-Ing. Bredeneyer Strasse 26 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | 02 /
Ballewski, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Wittrahmsweg 39 D-4133 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 03 /
Grossmann, Wolfgang Kranichstrasse 14 D-4130 Moers / DE | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Eberhard, Friedrich, et al Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Eberhard, Friedrich, Dr., et al Am Thyssenhaus 1 D-45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104247.1 | 27.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | DE19853512118 | 03.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3512118 | [1986/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198290 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198290 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198290 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B22C3/00, B22C9/00, B22C9/04, B22C1/02, B22D27/20, B22D25/06, B22D21/00 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
B22D21/007 (EP);
B22C3/00 (EP);
B22D27/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vergiessen von Aluminium-Legierungen | [1986/43] | English: | Method of casting aluminium alloys | [1986/43] | French: | Procédé pour la coulée d'alliages d'aluminium | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE963642 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]US3157926 (HORTON ROBERT A, et al); | [AD]US3259948 (FEAGIN ROY C); | [A]DE1433969 |