Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0197483
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.04.1992 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] |
03.05.1991 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |
11.05.1990 |
First examination report |
|
15.03.1990 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] |
14.12.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
07.12.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
19.04.1988 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] |
18.04.1988 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] |
29.08.1986 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] |