EP0202436 - Process for dyeing or printing cellulosic fibres or cellulosic mixed fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meininger, Fritz, Dr. Loreleistrasse 7 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 02 /
Mischke, Peter, Dr. Eichhornweg 2 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 03 /
König, Gerd, Dr. Breckenheimer Strasse 32 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Springer, Hartmut, Dr. Am Erdbeerstein 27 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1986/48] | Application number, filing date | 86104441.0 | 01.04.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | DE19853512630 | 06.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3512630 | [1986/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0202436 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0202436 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/66, C09B62/04, D06P3/852, D06P3/87 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
D06P3/8266 (EP,US);
D06P1/38 (KR);
D06P1/382 (EP,US);
D06P3/663 (EP,US);
D06P3/8219 (EP,US);
D06P3/8252 (EP,US);
Y10S8/918 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben oder Bedrucken von Cellulosefasern oder Cellulosemischfasern | [1986/48] | English: | Process for dyeing or printing cellulosic fibres or cellulosic mixed fibres | [1986/48] | French: | Procédé de teinture ou d'impression de fibres de cellulose ou de fibres mixtes de cellulose | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP60181373 ; | [X]GB927772 (ICI LTD); | [A]DE2634308 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB2051139 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB2054662 (ICI LTD); | [XP]EP0167219 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [AP]DE3529294 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 104, Nr. 16, April 1986, Seiten 77,78, Zusammenfassung Nr. 131410x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 181 373 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD) 17-09-1985, & JP60181373 A 00000000 |