EP0198358 - Cooling stand for bindings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lázár, Peter Tannenstrasse 11 D-41470 Neuss / DE | [1987/19] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states Swedex Vertriebs-GmbH für technische und elektrotechnische Geräte Mainstrasse 85 D-4040 Neuss21 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/22] |
Former [1986/43] | 01 /
Lázár, Peter Tannenstrasse 11 D-4040 Neuss 21 / DE | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [1987/19] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [1986/43] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104621.7 | 04.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | DE19850011498U | 18.04.1985 Original published format: DE 8511498 U | [1986/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198358 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198358 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198358 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B42C9/00, B42C13/00 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
B42C9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Kühlständer zum Abstellen von Einbänden | [1986/43] | English: | Cooling stand for bindings | [1986/43] | French: | Support de refroidissement de reliures | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.1990
14.12.1990
ADMISSIBLE Bindomatic AB Box 42101 Vretenborgsvaegen 9 126 12 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Westerlund, Christer John Axel, et al, et al L.A. Groth & Co Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 6107 S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.1990
14.12.1990
ADMISSIBLE Bindomatic AB Box 42101 Vretenborgsvaegen 9 126 12 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Westerlund, Christer, et al, et al L.A. Groth & Co Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 6107 S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | 20.12.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.06.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.05.1994 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.06.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.1993 | GB | 04.04.1993 | LU | 04.04.1993 | SE | 05.04.1993 | BE | 30.04.1993 | CH | 30.04.1993 | LI | 30.04.1993 | NL | 01.11.1993 | FR | 29.12.1993 | DE | 01.01.1994 | [2004/38] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
GB | 04.04.1993 | ||
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
BE | 30.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1993 | ||
NL | 01.11.1993 | ||
FR | 29.12.1993 | ||
DE | 01.01.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
GB | 04.04.1993 | ||
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
BE | 30.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
NL | 01.11.1993 | ||
FR | 29.12.1993 | ||
DE | 01.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
GB | 04.04.1993 | ||
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
BE | 30.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
NL | 01.11.1993 | ||
DE | 01.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
GB | 04.04.1993 | ||
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
BE | 30.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
NL | 01.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
GB | 04.04.1993 | ||
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 04.04.1993 | |
SE | 05.04.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | SE | 05.04.1993 | |
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | SE | 05.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2189215 (GEN BINDING CORP [US]); | [A]US3908215 (WATSON DONALD W) | Examination | FI47260 | DE654044 | FR1390426 | DE2029434 | EP0006274 | EP0031970 | CA1152049 | by applicant | DE654044 | FR1390426 | DE2029434 | FI47260C | DE2743685 | CA1152049 |