EP0197536 - Improvements in or relating to bicycle sprocket drive assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.1990 [1990/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THUN, INC. Alfred Thun Road P.O. Box 3159 Clarksville Tennessee / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states THUN, INC. Alfred Thun Road P.O. Box 3159 Clarksville Tennessee / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharon, Wilfred John 108 Kimbrough Court Clarksville Tennessee / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104729.8 | 07.04.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | US19850721607 | 10.04.1985 Original published format: US 721607 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197536 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197536 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197536 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62M3/00 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B62M3/00 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Fahrradkettenrad mit Antriebseinheit | [1986/42] | English: | Improvements in or relating to bicycle sprocket drive assemblies | [1986/42] | French: | Unité de transmission à pignon de chaîne de bicyclette | [1986/42] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 13.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1493691 (P LIMOUZIN FILS DE); | [Y]BE466176 ; | [AD]US3377883 (ALFRED THUN); | [A]BE469749 ; | [A]DE2532856 (FLICKER DIETRICH DIPL ING) |