EP0205788 - Domestic dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stickel, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Hirschstrasse 24 D-7928 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Mailänder, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Gotenweg 14 D-7920 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
Jerg, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Burgbergerweg 15 D-7928 Giengen / DE | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86104782.7 | 08.04.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19853522901 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522901 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205788 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205788 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
A47L15/4291 (EP);
A47L15/4229 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine | [1986/52] | English: | Domestic dishwasher | [1986/52] | French: | Lave-vaisselle ménager | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2139084 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]FR2461480 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2485363 (AWECO APP & GERAETEBAU KG [DE]); | [A]DE3244409 (AWECO APP & GERAETEBAU KG [DE]); | [A]FR2442037 (SCHROTT HUGO [DE]) |