EP0205789 - Pressure and temperature sensor for fluidic systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydrotechnik GmbH Holzheimer Strasse 94-96 D-65549 Limburg / DE | [1986/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Manfred Lahnblick 28 D-6251 Altendiez / DE | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwalt Heinz Linser Fichtestrasse 8 16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwälte Heinz Linser Dipl. Ing. Eckhardt Eyer Postfach 10 22 10 D-63268 Dreieich / DE | Application number, filing date | 86104821.3 | 09.04.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19853513749 | 17.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3513749 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205789 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205789 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205789 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/04 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
G01K13/02 (EP,US);
G01L19/0007 (EP,US);
G01L19/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Druck- und Temperatursensor für fluidische Systeme | [1986/52] | English: | Pressure and temperature sensor for fluidic systems | [1986/52] | French: | Elément sensible à la pression et à la température pour systèmes à fluide | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Request for further processing for: | 20.03.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.1991 | IT | 31.07.1991 | NL | 31.07.1991 | AT | 09.04.1992 | CH | 30.04.1992 | LI | 30.04.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 31.07.1991 | |
IT | 31.07.1991 | ||
NL | 31.07.1991 | ||
AT | 09.04.1992 | ||
CH | 30.04.1992 | ||
LI | 30.04.1992 | ||
Former [1997/17] | BE | 31.07.1991 | |
NL | 31.07.1991 | ||
AT | 09.04.1992 | ||
CH | 30.04.1992 | ||
LI | 30.04.1992 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 31.07.1991 | |
NL | 31.07.1991 | ||
AT | 09.04.1992 | ||
CH | 30.04.1992 | ||
LI | 30.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 31.07.1991 | |
NL | 31.07.1991 | ||
CH | 30.04.1992 | ||
LI | 30.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 31.07.1991 | |
NL | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | NL | 31.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | DE722063 [ ] (WEIKERT RUDOLF); | US3559486 [ ] (GORMAR HELMUT); | DE3000110 [ ] (CISE SPA) |