EP0200099 - Control circuit for an electromagnetic relay to interrupt an AC circuit under tension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drebinger, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Bärmannstrasse 34 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1986/45] | Application number, filing date | 86105271.0 | 16.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | DE19853514300 | 19.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3514300 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200099 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200099 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200099 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/56 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
H01H9/56 (EP);
H01H47/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1986/45] | Title | German: | Ansteuerschaltung für ein elektromagnetisches Relais zum Schalten eines Wechselspannungs-Lastkreises | [1986/45] | English: | Control circuit for an electromagnetic relay to interrupt an AC circuit under tension | [1986/45] | French: | Circuit de commande pour un relais électromagnétique pour interrompre un circuit à courant alternatif sous charge | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1072678 [ ]; | DE2143292 [ ] (ROUVET JAQUES); | DE2929261 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | FR2488036 [ ] (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) | Examination | EP0108538 |