EP0200112 - Swimming pool, in particular a covered swimming pool, with a normal basin and a hot water basin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1990 [1990/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menerga Apparatebau GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 51 45473 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states Menerga Apparatebau GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 51 D-45473 Mülheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doerk, Horst Am Hammershöfchen 3 D-4300 Essen 18 / DE | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105364.3 | 17.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | DE19853515292 | 27.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3515292 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200112 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200112 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200112 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/20 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
E04H4/1209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Schwimmbadanlage, insbesondere Hallenbadanlage, mit einem normalen Schwimmbecken und einem Warmwasserbecken | [1986/45] | English: | Swimming pool, in particular a covered swimming pool, with a normal basin and a hot water basin | [1986/45] | French: | Piscine, notamment piscine couverte, comprenant un bassin normal et un bassin à eau chaude | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/11] | 08.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3483863 (VANE HARRY M DE); | [A]FR2300297 (GADRAS ET CHAMPION SA [FR]); | [A]FR2390944 (FOX POOL CORP [US]); | [A]DE3425315 (DORFMUELLER JOACHIM) |