EP0198512 - Mechanism for switching mode of operations in a magnetic recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osawa, Atsuo Keimeiryo 505 850, Maiokacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | 02 /
Ogiro, Kenji 1004-10, Shimokuratacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Yokoo, Shouzou Green Park Totsuka 403 753, Totsukacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Hidekazu Yorii Apartment 215 391-2, Tabiko Katsuta-shi / JP | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/43] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105426.0 | 18.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | JP19850082434 | 19.04.1985 Original published format: JP 8243485 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198512 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198512 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/665 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
G11B15/22 (EP,US);
G11B15/6653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/43] | Title | German: | Schaltmechanismus in einem Gerät für magnetische Aufzeichnung/Wiedergabe | [1986/43] | English: | Mechanism for switching mode of operations in a magnetic recording/reproducing apparatus | [1986/43] | French: | Mécanisme pour commuter le mode de connection d'opérations dans un appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction magnétique | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 07.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.08.1990 | GB | 18.04.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1992/16] | FR | 21.12.1990 | |
GB | 18.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/40] | FR | 21.12.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | DE3406887 [ ] (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | DE3412527 [ ] (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | EP0115075 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | EP0087952 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | US4408236 [ ] (MURATA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) |