EP0207248 - Adaptive signal detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTRO GmbH Gesellschaft für Strahlungstechnik Postfach 102 120, Kurpfalzring 106 D-69011 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states ELTRO GmbH Gesellschaft für Strahlungstechnik Postfach 102 120, Kurpfalzring 106 D-69011 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welz, Wolfgang Mühlenweg 2b D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Muschka, Wilhelm Eltro GmbH Gesellschaft für Strahlungstechnik Kurpfalzring 106 Postfach 10 21 20 69011 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Muschka, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Eltro GmbH Gesellschaft für Strahlungstechnik Kurpfalzring 106 Postfach 10 21 20 D-69011 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105670.3 | 24.04.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | DE19853524021 | 05.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524021 | [1987/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0207248 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0207248 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207248 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, G01S7/28, H03K5/08 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
G01S7/2922 (EP);
G01S7/4873 (EP);
H03K5/082 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/02] | G01S7/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Adaptiver Signaldetektor | [1987/02] | English: | Adaptive signal detector | [1987/02] | French: | Détecteur de signal adaptatif | [1987/02] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 13.11.1991 | [1992/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0113892 (ELTRO GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE1229143 (VAKUTRONIK WISSENSCHAFTLICHER) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, Band IM-30, Nr. 4, Dezember 1981, Seiten 299-301, IEEE, New York, US; R. LUMIA: "A variable-threshold digitizer for photodiode arrays" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 129 (E-179)[1274], 4. Juni 1983; & 58 46 717 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 18-03-1983 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 18, Nr. 10, März 1976, Seiten 3210-3212, New York, US; S.S. CROW: "Comparator with adaptive minimum threshold" |