EP0200181 - Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/45] | Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization and stabilized resin compositions | ||
[1992/36] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44318 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharaby, Zaev 3391 Altamont Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44118 / US | 02 /
Vyvoda, Josef Cyril 287 Greenbriar Drive Avon Lake Ohio 44012 / US | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/45] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86105784.2 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | US19850728549 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: US 728549 | US19850728548 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: US 728548 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200181 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200181 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/42, C08F14/06, C08L27/06, C08K5/00, C08K5/13 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
C08F14/06 (EP);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F2/42 (EP);
C08K5/13 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/38 (EP);
C08K5/13, C08L27/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abbruch einer radikalischen Polymerisation | [1992/36] | English: | Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization | [1992/36] | French: | Procédé pour arrêter une polymérisation radicalaire | [1992/36] |
Former [1986/45] | Verfahren zum Abbruch einer radikalischen Polymerisation und stabilisierte Harzmischungen | ||
Former [1986/45] | Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization and stabilized resin compositions | ||
Former [1986/45] | Procédé pour arrêter une polymérisation radicalaire et compositions de résines stabilisées | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/13: Teilanmeldung 93100846.0 eingereicht am 25/04/86 | EPB 1993/13: Divisional application 93100846.0 filed on 25/04/86 | EPB 1993/13: Demande divisionnaire 93100846.0 déposée le 25/04/86 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP93100846.0 / EP0542720 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2662867 (BRUCE HOERTZ JOSEPH); | [YD]US4435524 (DINBERGS KORNELIUS [US]) |