EP0202521 - Container with interlocking lid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Reaktor GmbH Dudenstrasse 44 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | For all designated states Deutsche Gesellschaft für Wiederaufarbeitung von Kernbrennstoffen mbH Postfach 14 07 30014 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states ABB Reaktor GmbH Dudenstrasse 44 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
For all designated states Deutsche Gesellschaft für Wiederaufarbeitung von Kernbrennstoffen mbH Postfach 14 07 D-30014 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states BROWN BOVERI REAKTOR GmbH Dudenstrasse 44 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | ||
For all designated states Deutsche Gesellschaft für Wiederaufarbeitung von Kernbrennstoffen mbH Postfach 14 07 D-30014 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pötz, Franz Kreutzberger Strasse 36 D-6148 Heppenheim / DE | 02 /
Oswald, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Trojanstrasse 6 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | 03 /
Popp, Franz-Wolfgang, Dr. Ing. Kuhstrasse 5 D-3002 Wedemark / DE | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1986/48] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106079.6 | 02.05.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | DE19853518181 | 21.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518181 | [1986/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202521 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202521 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21F5/00 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
G21F5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | Behälter mit einem verriegelbaren Deckel | [1986/48] | English: | Container with interlocking lid | [1986/48] | French: | Conteneur avec obturateur verrouillable | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3997078 (MELTON DONALD F, et al); | [AD]DE2738592 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [A]FR2430651 (TRANSNUKLEAR GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]DE2839423 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [A]FR2536048 (NERSA CENTRALE NUCLEAIRE EUROP [FR]) |