EP0202522 - Process for the racemic resolution of D,L-2-aminobutan-1-ol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanzendoerfer, Franz, Dr. Bruchstrasse 40 D-6701 Ellerstadt / DE | 02 /
Fritz, Gerhard, Dr. Limburgerstrasse 23 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 03 /
Siegel, Hardo, Dr. Hans-Purrman-Allee 25 D-6720 Speyer / DE | [1986/48] | Application number, filing date | 86106089.5 | 03.05.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | DE19853517108 | 11.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3517108 | [1986/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0202522 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0202522 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202522 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07B57/00, C07C91/04 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
C07C51/487 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Racematspaltung von D,L-2-Aminobutan-1-ol | [1986/48] | English: | Process for the racemic resolution of D,L-2-aminobutan-1-ol | [1986/48] | French: | Procédé pour la résolution racémique du D,L-2-aminobutane-1-ol | [1986/48] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036265 (NOHIRA HIROYUKI [JP]); | [A]EP0000518 (RIEDEL DE HAEN AG [DE]) |