EP0201068 - Process for the production of needle-shaped ferromagnetic metallic iron oxides principally containing iron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwab, Ekkehard, Dr. Maxburgstrasse 1 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Steck, Werner, Dr. Auerstrasse 4 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Rudolf, Peter, Dr. Nibelungenweg 14 D-6701 Maxdorf / DE | 04 /
Vaeth, Guenter Woogstrasse 35 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
Jakusch, Helmut, Dr. Lorscher Ring 6 c D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
Kovacs, Jenoe, Dr. Kantstrasse 9 D-6717 Hessheim / DE | [1986/46] | Application number, filing date | 86106090.3 | 03.05.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | DE19853516884 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3516884 | [1986/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201068 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201068 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201068 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0201068 | Date: | 19.08.1991 | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/06, B22F9/22, B22F1/02 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
G11B5/70615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung nadelförmiger, im wesentlichen aus Eisen bestehender ferromagnetischer Metallteilchen | [1986/46] | English: | Process for the production of needle-shaped ferromagnetic metallic iron oxides principally containing iron | [1986/46] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de particules métalliques ferromagnétiques aciculaires contenant principalement du fer | [1986/46] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0015485 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4305753 (FRENCH JAMES E) |