EP0201079 - Delayed solid phase immunologic assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICHOLS INSTITUTE DIAGNOSTICS 33608 Ortega Highway San Juan Capistrano, CA 92690-6130 / US | [1996/50] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states Zahradnik, Richard 31091 Via Sonora San Juan Capistrano California 92675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahradnik, Richard 3109 Via Sonora San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | [1996/50] |
Former [1986/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106173.7 | 06.05.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | US19850731470 | 07.05.1985 Original published format: US 731470 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201079 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201079 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201079 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/74, G01N33/92, G01N33/573, G01N33/577, G01N33/76, C07K16/00, C07K16/16, C07K16/26 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/538 (EP,US);
G01N33/54353 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/817 (EP,US);
Y10S436/824 (EP,US);
Y10S530/862 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/46] | G01N33/543, G01N33/74, G01N33/92, G01N33/573, G01N33/577, G01N33/76, C07K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Verzögerter immunologischer Test in fester Phase | [1986/46] | English: | Delayed solid phase immunologic assay | [1986/46] | French: | Essai immunologique retardé en phase solide | [1986/46] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 19.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1988 | 31.05.1995 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1996 | BE | 17.04.1996 | CH | 17.04.1996 | LI | 17.04.1996 | NL | 17.04.1996 | LU | 31.05.1996 | SE | 17.07.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
CH | 17.04.1996 | ||
LI | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 31.05.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 31.05.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 22.07.1996 | ||
LI | 22.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
LU | 31.05.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2951678 (E Y LAB INC); | [Y]US4228237 (HEVEY RICHARD C, et al); | [Y]US4253995 (KATZ DAVID H); | [AD]GB2074727 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [YD]US4343896 (WOLTERS GERRIT, et al); | [X]WO8404171 (QUIDEL [US]); | [X]WO8500663 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [YP]EP0160900 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [ ] - The Journal of Histochemistry and Cytochemistry, Vol. 27, No. 8, August 1979, pages 1131-1139; The Histochem. Soc. Inc., US, J.L. GUESDON et al.: "The use of avidin-biotin interaction in immunoenzymatic techniques". |