EP0203435 - Novel pyridine derivatives and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Takashi 7-10-8, Oizumigakuencho Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohi, Nobuhiro 6-24-15, Honcho Hoya-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohsugi, Yoshiyuki 25-6, Nakajimacho Kodaira-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamashita, Yasuhiro 6-23-10, Togoshi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106358.4 | 09.05.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | JP19850110642 | 23.05.1985 Original published format: JP 11064285 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203435 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203435 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203435 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/81, A61K31/44 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D213/62 (KR);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Pyridinderivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1986/49] | English: | Novel pyridine derivatives and process for preparing the same | [1986/49] | French: | Dérivés de pyridine et leur procédé de préparation | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.1990 | NL | 29.08.1990 | SE | 29.08.1990 | GB | 09.05.1991 | [2002/23] |
Former [1992/16] | AT | 29.08.1990 | |
NL | 29.08.1990 | ||
GB | 09.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/34] | AT | 29.08.1990 | |
NL | 29.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 29.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP58159465 ; | [AD]JP58105920 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, 1984, page 570, abstract no. 51459x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 159 465 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD) 21-09-1983, & JP58159465 A 00000000 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, 1983, page 360, abstract no. 128362f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 105 920 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD) 24-06-1983, & JP58105920 A 00000000 |