EP0201883 - Advanced medical robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANDRONIC DEVICES Ltd. P.O. Box 58221 Vancouver British Columbia V6P 6E4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/47] | For all designated states ANDRONIC DEVICES Ltd. P.O. Box 58221 Vancouver British Columbia V6P 6E4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEwen, James Allen 5259 Turquoise Drive Richmond British Columbia V7C 4Z6 / CA | 02 /
Auchinleck, Geoffrey Fletcher 5-1182 West 7th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6H 1B4 / CA | 03 /
Osborne, John Calvin 209-2920 Ash Street Vancouver British Columbia V5Z 4A6 / CA | 04 /
Bohl, Rainer Mattias 41 East 40th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V5W 1L3 / CA | 05 /
Jager, Walter Johann 45 Helene Crescent Waterloo Ontario N2L 5E6 / CA | [1986/47] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | [2008/38] |
Former [1986/47] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86106362.6 | 09.05.1986 | [1986/47] | Priority number, date | US19850733762 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: US 733762 | US19860831001 | 19.02.1986 Original published format: US 831001 | [1986/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201883 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201883 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
B25J19/02 (EP);
A61B34/70 (EP);
B25J13/003 (EP);
B25J13/081 (EP);
B25J18/00 (EP);
B25J19/0004 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/47] | Title | German: | Medizinischer Roboter | [1986/47] | English: | Advanced medical robot | [1986/47] | French: | Robot médical | [1986/47] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4294236 (HOFSTEIN STEVEN R); | [Y]EP0057609 (NAUTILUS SPORTS MED IND [US]); | [XE]EP0166464 (OFMEC OFF MECC MANTOVANE SPA [IT]) |