EP0201908 - Acrylonitrile spinning solution and process for producing fibers therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/15] |
Former [1986/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-19, Kyobashi 2-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimori, Teruhiko c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd. No.20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Furutani, Yoshifumi c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd. No.20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Shiraishi, Yoshinobu c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd. No.20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
Yasunaga, Toshiyuki c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd. No.20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima / JP | [1986/47] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/47] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106460.8 | 13.05.1986 | [1986/47] | Priority number, date | JP19850100536 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: JP 10053685 | JP19850107021 | 21.05.1985 Original published format: JP 10702185 | [1986/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0201908 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201908 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201908 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/18 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
D01F6/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/47] | Title | German: | Acrylnitrilspinnlösung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fasern daraus | [1986/47] | English: | Acrylonitrile spinning solution and process for producing fibers therewith | [1986/47] | French: | Solution d'acrylonitrile pour le filage et procédé pour en fabriquer des fibres | [1986/47] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5240560 ; | [AD]JP6021905 ; | [E]EP0180975 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]US3697492 (CHAMP ANTONY E, et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 29 (C-77)[1524], 28th March 1977; & JP-A-52 40 560 (MITSUBISHI RAYON K.K.) 29-03-1977, & JP5240560 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 134 (C-285)[1857], 8th June 1985; & JP-A-60 21 905 (TORAY K.K.) 04-02-1985, & JP6021905 A 00000000 |