EP0202592 - Pressure-tight plug coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 89257 Illertissen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 D-7918 Illertissen / DE | 02 /
Weh, Wolfgang Siemensstrasse 5 D-7918 Illertissen / DE | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 86106530.8 | 14.05.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | DE19853518019 | 20.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3518019 | DE19853536916 | 16.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3536916 | [1986/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202592 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202592 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12, F16L37/28, F16L37/00 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
F16L37/1215 (EP,US);
F16L37/28 (KR);
F16L55/136 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87973 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | Druckdichte Steckkupplung | [1986/48] | English: | Pressure-tight plug coupling | [1986/48] | French: | Accouplement enfichable et résistant à la pression | [1986/48] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 11.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2128702 [ ] (VANN INC GEO); | DE2400494 [ ] (HOZELOCK LTD); | WO8402566 [ ] (WEH ERWIN [DE]); | US2388179 [ ] (THOMAS PROWD WILLIAM) |