Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE47354T | 15.11.1989 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86106583 | 15.05.1986 | DE3518154 | 21.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3617096 | 27.11.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3617096 | 21.05.1986 | DE3518154 | 21.05.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3666384D1 | 23.11.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3666384 | 15.05.1986 | DE3518154 | 21.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0204188 | Global Dossier | 18.10.1989 | B1 | EP0204188 | 10.12.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3518154 | 21.05.1985 |