Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] |
01.07.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.08.1989 [1989/33] |
09.03.1989 | Change - representative | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] |
23.06.1988 | First examination report | |
04.05.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] |
24.10.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.12.1986 [1986/50] |