EP0246350 - Coagulation electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH Ebertstrasse 35 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH. Ebertstrasse 35 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farin, Günter Kapellenweg 15 D-7400 Tübingen-Hirschau / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Klaus Immengasse 1 D-7270 Nagold-Emmingen / DE | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Endlich, Fritz Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | Endlich, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107026.6 | 23.05.1986 | [1987/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0246350 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/39 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
A61B18/1442 (EP);
A61B18/1402 (EP);
A61B2017/00097 (EP);
A61B2018/00005 (EP);
A61B2018/00023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1987/48] | Title | German: | Koagulationselektrode | [1987/48] | English: | Coagulation electrode | [1987/48] | French: | Electrode pour coaguler | [1987/48] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/03] | 24.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4074718 ; | [A]DE3215832 ; | [A]DE2656278 ; | [A]GB2002236 |