EP0203580 - Gamma-IFN as an agent for the inhibition (hindering) of the decay process of bones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peterlik, Meinrad, Prof. Dr. Berggasse 25/28 A-1090 Wien / AT | 02 /
Hoffmann, Oskar Buchengasse 17-19/41 A-1100 Wien / AT | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 86107225.4 | 28.05.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | DE19853519361 | 30.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3519361 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203580 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203580 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203580 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/66 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61K38/217 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/49] | A61K45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | Gamma-IFN als Wirkstoff zur Hemmung (Verhinderung) von Abbauprozessen im Knochen | [1986/49] | English: | Gamma-IFN as an agent for the inhibition (hindering) of the decay process of bones | [1986/49] | French: | Gamma-IFN comme agent d'inhibition (d'empêchement) de processus de décomposition des os | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 03.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0180737 (BIOFERON BIOCHEM SUBSTANZ [DE]) | [XP] - FEBS LETT., Band 185, Nr. 2, Juni 1985, Seiten 287-290, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; M. PETERLIK et al.: "Recombinat gamma-interferon inhibits prostaglandin-mediated and parathyroid hormone-induced bone resorption in cultured neonatal mouse calvaria" | [XP] - THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Band 136, Nr. 7, 1. April 1986, Seiten 2478-2481, The American Association of Immunologists, US; M. GOWEN et al.: "Actions of recombinant interleukin 1, interleukin 2, and interferon-gamma on bone resoption in vitro" | [X] - FEBS LETT. Band 180, Nr. 1, Januar 1985, Seiten 43-50, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; M.L. STEPHENSON et al.: "Immune interferon inhibits collagen synthesis by rheumatoid synovial cells associated with decreased levels of the procollagen mRNAs" | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, Band 120, Nr. 2, 30. April 1984, Seiten 553-558, Academic Press, Inc.; R.L. JILKA et al.: "Inhibition of parathormone-stimulated bone resorption by type 1 interferon" | [A] - JOURNAL OF INTERFERON RESEARCH, Band 4, Nr. 1, 1984, Seiten 135-140, Mary Ann Liebert, Inc., Publishers; O.S. NILSSON et al.: "Effect of interferon on heterotopic new bone formation in mice" | Examination | - Pathologie (3), R.Bässler , Böcker et al., S.764-769; Springer-Verlag 1984 |