EP0215195 - Hydraulic propulsion device for a shuttle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emil Jäger GmbH & Co. KG Dahlweg 105 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1987/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hundertmark, Axel Einsteinstrasse 23 D-4404 Telgte / DE | 02 /
Hambrock, Dieter Brunostrasse 4 D-4404 Münster / DE | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107238.7 | 28.05.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | DE19853529288 | 16.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3529288 | [1987/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215195 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215195 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D03D49/42 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
D03D49/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Hydraulisch betriebene Antriebseinrichtung für Webschützen | [1987/13] | English: | Hydraulic propulsion device for a shuttle | [1987/13] | French: | Dispositif de propulsion hydraulique pour navette | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 22.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0054844 [ ] (JAEGER EMIL KG [DE]); | DE3101417 [ ] (JAEGER EMIL KG [DE]); | DE3406137 [ ] (JAEGER EMIL GMBH CO KG) |