EP0209687 - Telephone answering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmert, Reinhold, Ing. grad. Reiherstrasse 14 D-8510 Fürth / DE | [1987/05] | Application number, filing date | 86107564.6 | 04.06.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | DE19853525127 | 13.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3525127 | [1987/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209687 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209687 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209687 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/65 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
H04M1/652 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/05] | Title | German: | Anrufbeantworter | [1987/05] | English: | Telephone answering device | [1987/05] | French: | Répondeur téléphonique | [1987/05] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5754458 ; | [Y]JP5757063 ; | [Y]US4301480 ; | [A]DE2749948 ; | [A]GB2143705 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 128 (E-118)[1006], 14. Juli 1982; & JP-A-57 54 458 (HASHIMOTO KOOPOREISHIYON K.K.) 31-03-1982, & JP5754458 A 00000000 | [YD] - NACHRICHTEN TECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 38, Heft 5, Mai 1985, Seite 355, Berlin, DE; "Verständliche Sprache im 'Schnellgang'" | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 132 (E-119)[1010], 17. Juli 1982; & JP-A-57 57 063 (HASHIMOTO KOOPOREISHIYON K.K.) 06-04-1982, & JP5757063 A 00000000 | [A] - FUNKSCHAU, Band 49, Nr. 18, August 1977, Seiten 847-851, München, DE; "Trotz veränderter Geschwindigkeit: Gleiche Tonhöhe" |