EP0236537 - Eccentric clamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bishop, Maurice E. Moultonville Road Center Ossipee New Hampshire 03814 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states Bishop, Maurice E. Moultonville Road Center Ossipee New Hampshire 03814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Finck, Dieter, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107962.2 | 11.06.1986 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | US19860838092 | 10.03.1986 Original published format: US 838092 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236537 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236537 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25B11/00 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
B23Q1/5468 (EP);
B23Q3/06 (KR);
B25B1/08 (EP);
B25B11/00 (EP,KR);
B25B5/08 (EP);
B25B5/163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/51] |
Former [1987/38] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | Exzentrische Klemmen | [1987/38] | English: | Eccentric clamps | [1987/38] | French: | Dispositifs de serrage excentriques | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1132060 [ ] (WESTINGER & ALTENBURGER); | EP0076096 [ ] (LINDSAY LTD HENRY [GB]); | US4139188 [ ] (AVEDIAN ARAM); | US2430613 [ ] (HODGE ROBERT W) |