EP0205169 - Bis-indole derivatives, process for preparing same and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T. Gyömröi ut 19-21 1475 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T. Gyömröi ut 19-21 H-1475 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szántay, Csaba, Dr. Zsombolyai ut 8 H-1113 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Szabó, Lajos, Dr. Visegrádi u. 3/b H-1132 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Honty, Katalin, Dr. Gébics u. 4/a H-1124 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Keve, Tibor, Dr. Hunyadlejtö 28 H-1124 Budapest / HU | 05 /
Acs, Tibor Szilárd u. 92 H-1174 Budapest / HU | 06 /
Eckhardt, Sándor, Dr. Julia u. 1 H-1026 Budapest / HU | 07 /
Sugár, János, Dr. Matróz 6 H-1051 Budapest / HU | 08 /
Somfai, Zsuzsa, Dr. Október 6. u. 16 H-1051 Budapest / HU | 09 /
Iván, Eva, Dr. Hajnóczi u. 6 H-1122 Budapest / HU | 10 /
Kneffel, Zsuzsa, Dr. Ajtósi Dürer sor 7 H-1146 Budapest / HU | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 85201 Dachau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 D-85201 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 86107968.9 | 12.06.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | HU19850002303 | 12.06.1985 Original published format: HU 230385 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205169 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205169 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205169 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D519/04, A61K31/475 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
C07D519/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/51] | Title | German: | Bis-indol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1986/51] | English: | Bis-indole derivatives, process for preparing same and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1986/51] | French: | Dérivés de bis-indole, procédé pour leur préparation et médicaments les contenant | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4310528 (JOVANOVICS KAROLA, et al); | [X]DE3132476 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]); | [X]DE3132475 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]) |