EP0206300 - Log turning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Jäckle GmbH Maschinen- & Gerätebau Büsslingerstrasse 25 D-7709 Hilzingen 3 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states Gebrüder Jäckle GmbH Maschinen- & Gerätebau Büsslingerstrasse 25 D-7709 Hilzingen 3 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäckle, Lothar Büsslingerstrasse 23 D-7709 Hilzingen 3 / DE | 02 /
Jäckle, Georg Büsslingerstrasse 23 D-7709 Hilzingen 3 / DE | 03 /
Jäckle, Franz Büsslingerstrasse 23 D-7709 Hilzingen 3 / DE | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | ||
Former [1986/52] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat. Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50 D-78229 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108510.8 | 21.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19850018093U | 21.06.1985 Original published format: DE 8518093 U | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0206300 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/00, B27B31/04, B27L1/00 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
B27B31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Wenden eines Baumstammes | [1986/52] | English: | Log turning apparatus | [1986/52] | French: | Appareil pour tourner des troncs d'arbres | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/08] | 28.09.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4249585 ; | [Y]DE2405639 ; | [X]US3267976 |