blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0212141

EP0212141 - Inflatable boat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.12.1987
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Schlauchbootfabrik Hans Scheibert GmbH & Co. KG
Postfach 1169
37628 Eschershausen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]For all designated states
Deutsche Schlauchbootfabrik Hans Scheibert GmbH & Co. KG
Postfach 1169
D-37628 Eschershausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gemeinhardt, Werner
Bruchweg
D-3456 Eschershausen / DE
02 / Hoffmann, Alfred
Rebenring 9
D-3456 Eschershausen / DE
03 / Klenke, Heinz
Am Ackerborn 7
D-3456 Eschershausen / DE
[1987/10]
Representative(s)Depmeyer, Lothar
i. Fa. Continental Gummi-Werke AG Königsworther Platz 1
30167 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]Depmeyer, Lothar
i. Fa. Continental Gummi-Werke AG Königsworther Platz 1 Postfach 169
D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE
Application number, filing date86108637.925.06.1986
[1987/10]
Priority number, dateDE1985352737031.07.1985         Original published format: DE 3527370
[1987/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0212141
Date:04.03.1987
Language:DE
[1987/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1986
ClassificationIPC:B63B7/08
[1987/10]
CPC:
B63B7/082 (EP); B63B2007/065 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/10]
TitleGerman:Schlauchboot[1987/10]
English:Inflatable boat[1987/10]
French:Bateau pneumatique[1987/10]
File destroyed:21.07.1995
Examination procedure27.03.1987Examination requested  [1987/22]
08.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1482860  (PENNEL & FLIPO ETS);
 [A]DE1964657  (METZELER AG);
 [A]GB1045015  (ROBERT FRYDLENDER)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.