EP0211224 - The use of a catalyst for reducing the nitrogen oxide content of combustion gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/09] | Catalyst for reducing the nitrogen oxide content of combustion gases | ||
[1989/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Michael, Dr. Waldparkstrasse 54a D-8012 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE | 02 /
Kochloefl, Karl, Dr. Kreuzstrasse 2 D-8052 Moosburg / DE | 03 /
Maletz, Gerd, Dr. Innere Regensburger Strasse 9a D-8300 Landshut / DE | 04 /
Wernicke, Hans Jürgen, Dr. Böhmerwaldstrasse 37g D-8192 Geretsried / DE | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108831.8 | 28.06.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | DE19853524160 | 05.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524160 | [1987/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211224 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211224 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01J29/02, B01J21/16 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,US);
B01J21/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Katalysators zur Verminderung des Stickoxidgehalts von Verbrennungsabgasen | [1989/35] | English: | The use of a catalyst for reducing the nitrogen oxide content of combustion gases | [1989/35] | French: | Utilisation d'un catalyseur pour diminuer le taux d'oxydes d'azotes des gaz de combustion | [1989/35] |
Former [1987/09] | Katalysator zur Verminderung des Stickoxidgehalts von Verbrennungsabgasen | ||
Former [1987/09] | Catalyst for reducing the nitrogen oxide content of combustion gases | ||
Former [1987/09] | Catalyseur pour diminuer le taux d'oxydes d'azotes des gaz de combustion | Examination procedure | 07.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.08.1989 | [1991/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3962135 (ALAFANDI HAMID ABDEL); | [Y]GB2162830 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) | [A] - FIFTH WORLD PETROLEUM CONGRESS, 1959, Section III, paper 9; W. FRANZ et al.: "Catalysts on the basis of acid-activated montmorillonites" |