blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0207488

EP0207488 - Control device for a signal box [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.1994
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft
Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/02]For all designated states
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft
Lorenzstrasse 10
D-70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Walter, Heinrich
Ingersheimer Strasse 8
D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE
[1987/02]
Representative(s)Pechhold, Eberhard, et al
Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/02]Pechhold, Eberhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29
D-70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date86108903.501.07.1986
[1987/02]
Priority number, dateDE1985352402305.07.1985         Original published format: DE 3524023
[1987/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0207488
Date:07.01.1987
Language:DE
[1987/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0207488
Date:28.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1988
ClassificationIPC:B61L21/00, B61L19/06
[1988/49]
CPC:
B61L21/00 (EP); B61L19/06 (EP)
Former IPC [1987/02]B61L21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI [1987/02]
TitleGerman:Steuereinrichtung für ein Relaisstellwerk[1987/02]
English:Control device for a signal box[1987/02]
French:Dispositif de commande pour une boîte de signaux[1987/02]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure28.07.1989Examination requested  [1990/44]
22.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.09.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1993Fee for grant paid
14.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/27]
31.01.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1994/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
16.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.07.1989M01   Fee paid on   22.08.1989
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.198904   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.1989
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1605420  (SIEMENS AG);
 [AD]DE2162067  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG)
 [A]  - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, Band 39, Nr. 3, 1964, Seiten 331,383-402, Brüssel, BE; W. SCHMITZ: "Geographic relay system, for railroad interlocked routing"
 [A]  - REVUE GENERALE DES CHEMINS DE FER, Band 91, Oktober 1972, Seiten 640-647, Paris, FR; J. MAJOU et al.: "L'évolution des postes de manoeuvre locaux"
 [AD]  - EISENBAHNTECHNISCHE PRAXIS, Nr. 2, 1979, Seiten 8-18, Frankfurt, DE; W. MORSCHEL: "Die wesentlichen Schaltungen der SpDrL-60-Technik"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.