blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0215212

EP0215212 - Supply unit for a medical nursing post [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.1988
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRILUX-LENZE GmbH + Co. KG
Heidestrasse
59759 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/13]For all designated states
TRILUX-LENZE GmbH & Co. KG
Heidestrasse
D-59759 Arnsberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lehrich, Karl
Christine-Koch-Strasse 21
D-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE
02 / Draken, Hans- Dieter
Zum Fürstenberg 36a
D-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE
[1987/13]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/29]Selting, Günther, et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [1987/13]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date86108975.302.07.1986
[1987/13]
Priority number, dateDE1985353322918.09.1985         Original published format: DE 3533229
[1987/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0215212
Date:25.03.1987
Language:DE
[1987/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0215212
Date:11.11.1987
Language:DE
[1987/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1987
ClassificationIPC:A61G12/00, A61G13/00
[1987/13]
CPC:
A61G13/107 (EP); A61G12/002 (EP); A61G12/004 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1987/13]
TitleGerman:Versorgungseinheit für eine medizinische Pflegestation[1987/13]
English:Supply unit for a medical nursing post[1987/13]
French:Unité d'alimentation pour un poste de soins médicaux[1987/13]
File destroyed:19.08.1994
Examination procedure12.05.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/52]
09.08.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/52]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE8509993U  ;
 [Y]DE2544221  ;
 [A]US3548122
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.