EP0216035 - Balance for analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher CH-8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüchinger, Paul Guldenenstrasse 49 CH-8610 Uster / CH | 02 /
Rutishauser, Heinz Wassbergstrasse 3 CH-8610 Uster / CH | 03 /
Wachter, Hanspeter Bettlistrasse 14 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/10] |
Former [1989/26] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109104.9 | 03.07.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | CH19850004056 | 18.09.1985 Original published format: CH 405685 | [1987/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216035 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216035 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216035 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/28, G01G21/30 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
G01G21/286 (EP,US);
G01G21/283 (EP,US);
G01G21/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/14] | Title | German: | Analysenwaage | [1987/14] | English: | Balance for analysis | [1987/14] | French: | Balance pour analyse | [1987/14] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]CH559901 (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG); | [Y]DE2505890 (ZEISS IKON AG); | [Y]WO8202536 (PAYNE REGINALD KENNETH, et al); | [Y]EP0059985 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | [A] - SIEMENS FORSCHUNGS- UND ENTWICKLUNGSBERICHTE, Band 10, Nr. 5, 1981, Seiten 316-322, Springer Verlag, Würzburg, DE; D. KLUGMANN et al.: "Principles and applications of automatic speech recognition" |