EP0208285 - Process for preparing linear organopolysiloxanes having triorganosiloxy terminal groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkhardt, Jürgen, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Isenbreite 25 D-8261 Winhöring / DE | [1987/03] | Application number, filing date | 86109226.0 | 07.07.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | DE19853524484 | 09.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524484 | [1987/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208285 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208285 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208285 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0208285 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/08, C08G77/06 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
C08G77/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von linearen Organopolysiloxanen mit Triorganosiloxygruppen als endständige Einheiten | [1987/03] | English: | Process for preparing linear organopolysiloxanes having triorganosiloxy terminal groups | [1987/03] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'organopolysiloxanes linéaires ayant des groupes triorganosiloxy terminaux | [1987/03] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2525041 ; | [Y]DE2313218 ; | [A]DE2229514 ; | [AD]DE2423531 ; | [AP]US4563513 (INOMATA HIROSHI [JP]) | Examination | DE2524041 |