EP0208288 - Planetary gear for driving track-mounted means and generic earthmovers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVA CALZONI S.p.A. Via Stendhal, 34 I-20144 Milano / IT | [1987/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amadesi, Gian Paolo Via Fermi 8 I-40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86109239.3 | 07.07.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | IT19850003499 | 10.07.1985 Original published format: IT 349985 | [1987/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208288 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208288 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/46, B62D55/125, // B60K17/04 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
F16H1/46 (EP);
B60K17/046 (EP);
B62D55/125 (EP);
F16D55/36 (EP);
F16D55/40 (EP);
F16D59/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/03] | Title | German: | Planeten-Endgetriebe für Kettenfahrzeuge und Erdbewegungsmaschinen | [1987/03] | English: | Planetary gear for driving track-mounted means and generic earthmovers | [1987/03] | French: | Transmission planétaire pour l'entraînement de véhicules chenillés et machines de travaux publics | [1987/03] | File destroyed: | 10.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/29] | 24.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH397440 (ZIEGLER WILLY [CH]); | [X]LU51386 (ACEC [BE]); | [A]FR2437314 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]WO8002821 (TOWMOTOR CORP [US], et al) |