EP0217013 - Gas spring adjustable in length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritz Bauer + Söhne oHG Industriestrasse 12-14 D-8503 Altdorf b. Nürnberg / DE | [1987/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Hans-Peter Ziegelhütte 9 D-8503 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Hans Jürgen Am Eichenhain 8 D-8503 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
Stadelmann, Ludwig Schopperstrasse 14 D-8503 Altdorf / DE | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109356.5 | 09.07.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | DE19850024995U | 31.08.1985 Original published format: DE 8524995 U | [1987/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217013 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217013 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/30, A47B9/10, F16F9/02 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
F16F9/0245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/15] | Title | German: | Längenverstellbare Gasfeder | [1987/15] | English: | Gas spring adjustable in length | [1987/15] | French: | Ressort à gaz réglable en longueur | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 09.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 26.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2334180 [ ] (STABILUS GMBH); | DE2705259 [ ] (SUSPA FEDERUNGSTECH); | DE2907100 [ ] (BAUER FRITZ & SOEHNE OHG) |