EP0219612 - Process for treating quench water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandl, Adrian, Dipl.-Ing. Himpendahlweg 1 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE | 02 /
Keller, Heinz Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Vethackeweg 22 D-4600 Dortmund 30 / DE | 03 /
Wehner, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Im Rosengrund 21 D-5840 Schwerte / DE | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109359.9 | 09.07.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | DE19853537493 | 22.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3537493 | [1987/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219612 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219612 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/84 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
B01D47/00 (EP,US);
C01B3/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/38 (EP,US);
C02F2001/007 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
C10J2300/169 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufbereitung von Quenchwasser | [1987/18] | English: | Process for treating quench water | [1987/18] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'eau de trempe | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1496384 (PROJEKTIERUNGS KONSTRUKTIONS U); | [X]GB2025453 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP); | [A]US4411670 (MARION CHARLES P [US], et al) |