EP0209081 - Sintered bodies of stabilized zirconia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Christopher E. 115 Dufferin Street Hamilton Ontario L8S 3N5 / CA | [1987/10] |
Former [1987/04] | 01 /
Knapp, Christopher E. 3915 Portage Road Apt. 202 Niagara Falls Ontario, L2J 4C8 / CA | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109405.0 | 09.07.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | US19850755399 | 16.07.1985 Original published format: US 755399 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209081 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209081 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/48 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B35/653 (EP);
H01M8/1253 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/04] | Title | German: | Sinterformkörper aus stabilisiertem Zirkoniumdioxid | [1987/04] | English: | Sintered bodies of stabilized zirconia | [1987/04] | French: | Corps frittés en zicorne stabilisée | [1987/04] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/43] | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS605067 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD); | [X]EP0131774 (NORTON CO [US]); | [XD]US4360598 (OTAGIRI TADASHI, et al); | [YD]US4344904 (YAMADA KOICHI, et al) |