EP0212237 - Device for the metering of a chemical, particularly for seed treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1989 [1989/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, David Brandon Stockhold Green Cottage Thurston Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk / GB | 02 /
Rollett, Andrew Charles 'Lindru' Bury Road Beyton Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk / GB | 03 /
Roberts, Donald Matthew 38 Caie Walk Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk / GB | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86109601.4 | 14.07.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | GB19850018943 | 26.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8518943 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0212237 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212237 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B67B7/48, B67D3/00, A61M5/14, A01M7/00, A01C1/08 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
A01C1/08 (EP,US);
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Dosierung eines chemischen Stoffes insbesondere für Saatbehandlung | [1987/10] | English: | Device for the metering of a chemical, particularly for seed treatment | [1987/10] | French: | Appareil pour le dosage d'un produit chimique, spécifiquement pour le traitement de semences | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 23.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2771878 (FOLLAND WILLARD E, et al); | [A]US3242924 (KRAFT HAROLD D, et al); | [A]DE2425613 (HAEBERLE & CO); | [A]US3993221 (BOYNTON EDGAR M, et al); | [A]GB2093732 (ICI PLC); | [Y]EP0086031 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]US4527716 (HAAS LOUIS M [US], et al) |