EP0213350 - Apparatus for the distillation separation of volatile substances from liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Extraktionstechnik Gesellschaft für Anlagenbau m.b.H. Humboldtstrasse 56 Postfach 76 03 69 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states Extraktionstechnik Gesellschaft für Anlagenbau m.b.H. Humboldtstrasse 56 Postfach 76 03 69 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Klaus Richterstrasse 13 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Joachim Moorburger Elbdeich 184 D-2100 Hamburg 90 / DE | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Planker, Karl-Josef Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Parkstrasse 10 Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Parkstrasse 10 Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109727.7 | 16.07.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | DE19853529328 | 16.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3529328 | [1987/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213350 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213350 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/28, F28D3/00, C11B3/14 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
B01D3/28 (EP);
C11B3/14 (EP);
F28D3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur destillativen Abtrennung von flüchtigen Substanzen aus Flüssigkeiten | [1987/11] | English: | Apparatus for the distillation separation of volatile substances from liquids | [1987/11] | French: | Dispositif pour l'expulsion distillative de substance volatile de liquides | [1987/11] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/03: (deleted) | EPB 1987/11: Ein Antrag gemäss Regel 88 auf Berichtigung einiger offensichtlicher Unrichtigkeiten in den Unterlagen wurde am 5 August 1986 eingereicht | Examination procedure | 25.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 31.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2511144 (RHEINSTAHL AG); | [X]DE18070 ; | [X]US2438988 (BARTHEL WILLIAM F); | [A]US2355414 (BORCHARDT LESTER F, et al); | [A]US2247152 (CORNELL JR FRITZ G); | [A]FR1128379 (SULZER AG) |