EP0218809 - Guiding probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hochberger, Jürgen Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 15/XI D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Ell, Christian, Dr. med. Burgbergstrasse D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1987/17] | Application number, filing date | 86109737.6 | 16.07.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | DE19853533452 | 19.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3533452 | [1987/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218809 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218809 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36, A61B17/22 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/245 (EP,US);
A61B90/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | Führungssonde | [1987/17] | English: | Guiding probe | [1987/17] | French: | Sonde de guidage | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 29.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Request for further processing for: | 18.07.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.10.1989 | GB | 11.10.1989 | NL | 11.10.1989 | SE | 11.10.1989 | [1991/13] |
Former [1990/42] | GB | 11.10.1989 | |
NL | 11.10.1989 | ||
SE | 11.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | NL | 11.10.1989 | |
SE | 11.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/21] | SE | 11.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8401294 (MEDICAL ENG CORP [US]); | [A]DE8517084U |