EP0216050 - Combined implement for soil cultivation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1993 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gattermann, Bernd Eichenwall 3 D-2872 Hude i. O. / DE | 02 /
Gehrke, Rudolf Lerchenweg 1 D-2990 Papenburg 1 / DE | [1987/14] | Application number, filing date | 86109802.8 | 17.07.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | DE19853533820 | 21.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3533820 | [1987/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216050 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216050 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216050 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01B29/02, A01B49/02, A01B49/06 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
A01B29/043 (EP);
A01B49/025 (EP);
A01B49/04 (EP);
A01B49/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/14] | Title | German: | Gerätekombination für Bodenbearbeitung | [1987/14] | English: | Combined implement for soil cultivation | [1987/14] | French: | Combinaisons de préparation du sol | [1987/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/43: Teilanmeldung 89122298.6 eingereicht am 24/08/88 | EPB 1991/43: Divisional application 89122298.6 filed on 24/08/88 | EPB 1991/43: Demande divisionnaire 89122298.6 déposée le 24/08/88 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89122298.6 / EP0373467 | EP89122299.4 / EP0365049 | EP89122300.0 / EP0365050 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.1992
23.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.1992
23.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | 02.09.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.02.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0091878 [ ]; | DE8512299U [ ]; | EP0033950 [ ]; | DE3032275 [ ]; | [YD]DE3218635 ; | [YD]DE3336313 ; | [Y]DE8350 ; | [Y]US4489790 |