EP0257105 - Pruning saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steiner, Walter Säntisstrasse 52 CH-8311 Brütten / CH | [1988/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/09] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann + Quehl AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86109934.9 | 19.07.1986 | [1988/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257105 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/08, B27B19/09 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
A01G3/08 (EP);
B23D51/046 (EP);
B23D61/12 (EP);
B27B19/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Astsäge | [1988/09] | English: | Pruning saw | [1988/09] | French: | Scie ébrancheuse | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/23] | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE884632 ; | [X]US3181239 ; | [X]DE3504257 ; | [A]DE3418768 ; | [A]DE8514381U ; | [A]US3715805 ; | [A]CH486193 |