Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0209876 | Global Dossier | 07.10.1987 | A3 | EP0209876 | 28.01.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT8338385 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1201974 | 02.02.1989 | B | Priority number | Date | IT8338385 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0757379B | 21.06.1995 | B2 | JPS6257718 | 13.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | IT8338385 | 22.07.1985 |