blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0217033

EP0217033 - Improved drive system with wear compensator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.1990
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/16]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Former [1987/15]For all designated states
Canadian Fram Limited
540 Park Avenue East P.O. Box 2014
Chatham Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / McWilliam, Richard Donald c/o Allied Corporation
P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
02 / Anderson, Andrew Gordon c/o Allied Corporation
P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
03 / McCharles, Donald Alexander c/o Allied Corporation
P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
04 / McLaren, Donald James c/o Allied Corporation
P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
05 / Yew, Kwang c/o Allied Corporation
P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
[1987/15]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1990/16]
Former [1989/13]Turner, Alan Reginald
BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road
Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB
Former [1987/15]Brullé, Jean
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date86110034.522.07.1986
[1987/15]
Priority number, dateUS1985077133830.08.1985         Original published format: US 771338
[1987/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0217033
Date:08.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:F16D27/00, F02B67/06
[1987/15]
CPC:
F02B67/06 (EP,US); B60K17/00 (KR); F16H9/06 (EP,US);
F02B2275/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1987/15]
TitleGerman:Antriebssystem mit Kompensation der Abnutzung[1987/15]
English:Improved drive system with wear compensator[1987/15]
French:Système d'entraînement avec compensation de l'usure[1987/15]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure02.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
29.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/35]
03.04.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1990/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.198904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2124321  (VALEO);
 [Y]CH244129  (DOEBELI ALBERT [CH]);
 [Y]FR2486610  (PARIS & DU RHONE [FR]);
 [XP]GB2159596  (VALEO);
 [A]US3884089  (AVRAMIDIS STELLIOS ANTONY)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.